Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Munyanyi

Bishop Emeritus of Gweru, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1956 Born
3 Sep 198327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Gweru, Zimbabwe
11 May 200650.3AppointedBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe
26 Aug 200650.6Ordained BishopBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe
28 Apr 201256.3ResignedBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Martin Munyanyi
Bishop Martin Munyanyi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gweru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBikita

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gweru.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,229
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Apr 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018