Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Aloysius Haene, S.M.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Gwelo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Aug 1910BornKirchberg
2 Apr 193928.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Bethlehem Mission Immensee
28 Mar 194736.6AppointedPrefect of Fort Victoria, Zimbabwe
25 Jun 195039.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Nepte
25 Jun 195039.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fort Victoria, Zimbabwe
1 Oct 195040.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nepte
1 Jan 195544.4AppointedBishop of Gwelo, Zimbabwe
3 Feb 197766.5ResignedBishop of Gwelo, Zimbabwe
19 Feb 199988.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Gwelo, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Aloysius Haene:
Bishop Aloysius Haene S.M.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Gwelo

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 48.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 158, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013