Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Aston Ignatius (Sebastian Joseph) Chichester, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Salisbury

Titular Archbishop of Velebusdus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1879BornOstende, Belgium
21 Sep 191334.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
24 Feb 193151.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
24 Feb 193151.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Ubaza
19 Jul 193152.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ubaza
1 Jan 195575.6AppointedArchbishop of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
23 Nov 195677.5RetiredArchbishop of Salisbury, Zimbabwe
23 Nov 195677.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Velebusdus
24 Oct 196283.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Salisbury, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Aston Ignatius (Sebastian Joseph) Chichester:
Archbishop Aston Ignatius (Sebastian Joseph) Chichester S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Salisbury

  • a priest for 49.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations …piscopales, Issue 1931, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013