Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Robert Christopher Ndlovu

Archbishop of Harare, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Dec 1955 Born
28 Aug 198327.6Ordained PriestPriest of Hwange, Zimbabwe
9 Feb 199943.1AppointedBishop of Hwange, Zimbabwe
9 May 199943.3Ordained BishopBishop of Hwange, Zimbabwe
10 Jun 200448.4AppointedArchbishop of Harare, Zimbabwe
21 Aug 200448.6InstalledArchbishop of Harare, Zimbabwe
17 Feb 201660.1AppointedApostolic Administrator of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe
7 Apr 201862.2CeasedApostolic Administrator of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Robert Christopher Ndlovu
Archbishop Robert Christopher Ndlovu (born ) Archbishop of Harare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTshongokwe

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Harare.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 155, Number 13,548
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast