Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bulawayo

Archidioecesis Bulauaiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Alex Thomas Kaliyanil, S.V.D., Archbishop
  • Pius Alick Mvundla Ncube, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 June 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zimbabwe
  • Square Kilometers: 66,956 (25,861 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.bulawayoarchdiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, 108A Ninth Avenue, Lobengula Street, P.O. Box 837, Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
  • Telephone: (09)63.590
  • Fax: 60.359

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bulawayo
4 January 1931ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Salisbury Mission "Sui Iuris" of Bulawayo (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Bulawayo
18 July 1932ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Bulawayo Prefecture Apostolic of Bulawayo
Vicariate Apostolic of Bulawayo
13 April 1937ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Bulawayo Vicariate Apostolic of Bulawayo
29 June 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Bulawayo
Vicariate Apostolic of Salisbury
Prefecture Apostolic of Wankie (erected)
Diocese of Bulawayo
1 January 1955ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Bulawayo Diocese of Bulawayo
2 April 1959Territory LostDiocese of Bulawayo
Diocese of Kimberley
Vicariate Apostolic of Windhoek
Prefecture Apostolic of Bechuanaland (erected)
Archdiocese of Bulawayo
10 June 1994ElevatedDiocese of Bulawayo Archdiocese of Bulawayo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Bulawayo
195013,654370,0003.7%417216508710ap1951
Diocese of Bulawayo
195931,771486,8516.5%13940794541776ap1960
197060,544668,5009.1%245471,2886520412ap1971
198071,511820,0008.7%730371,93294514125ap1981
199095,6301,247,6437.7%841491,95155217230ap1991
Archdiocese of Bulawayo
1999113,7821,600,0007.1%1644601,896105616731ap2000
2000107,5151,648,0006.5%1344571,886105919031ap2001
2001105,6751,694,0006.2%2041611,732105417434ap2002
2002108,3321,745,0006.2%2847751,444105915735ap2003
2003109,8391,790,0006.1%2642681,615107014338ap2004
2004111,9571,830,0006.1%2842701,599106914238ap2005
2006113,2661,849,0006.1%2732591,919204414038ap2007
2012121,0002,031,0006.0%3943821,4751911714943ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013