Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alex Thomas Kaliyanil, S.V.D.

Archbishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 May 1960 Born
198726.5ProfessedMember of Society of the Divine Word
7 May 198827.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
20 Jun 200949.0AppointedArchbishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe
12 Sep 200949.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bulawayo, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Alex Thomas Kaliyanil
Archbishop Alex Thomas Kaliyanil S.V.D. (born ) Archbishop of Bulawayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallamchira, India

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bulawayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Jun 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast