Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Xavier Mugadzi

Deceased

Bishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1931Born
12 Dec 196433.8Ordained PriestPriest of Gweru, Zimbabwe
25 Oct 198857.6AppointedBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe
14 Jan 198957.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe
6 Feb 200472.9DiedBishop of Gweru, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Francis Xavier Mugadzi
Bishop Francis Xavier Mugadzi (born , died ) Bishop of Gweru

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGokomere

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Number 10,035
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast