Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Henry Ambrose Griffiths

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Gaza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1903Born
12 Mar 192723.6Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 Oct 194946.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Military, USA
15 Oct 194946.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaza
18 Jan 195046.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaza
Sep 1955³52.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA
24 Feb 196460.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of New York, New York, USA

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for James Henry Ambrose Griffiths
Bishop James Henry Ambrose Griffiths (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of New York

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn

  • a priest for 36.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 2
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1965, Page 1,367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast