Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfredo Antonio Francisco Müller y San Martín

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1902BornHabana
21 Aug 192724.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
17 Apr 194845.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
17 Apr 194845.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Anaea
6 Jun 194845.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anaea
5 Apr 196158.5AppointedBishop of Cienfuegos, Cuba
24 Jul 197168.8ResignedBishop of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara, Cuba
2 Sep 199390.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Alfredo Antonio Francisco Müller y San Martín:
Bishop Alfredo Antonio Francisco Müller y San Martín (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cienfuegos-Santa Clara

  • a priest for 66.0 years
  • a bishop for 45.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 62
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013