Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Evelio Ramos Díaz

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

Titular Bishop of Croae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1923Born
11 Jul 194824.8Ordained PriestPriest of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
26 Oct 197047.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba
26 Oct 197047.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Croae
14 Jan 197147.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Croae
25 Nov 197653.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana, Cuba

MicroData Summary for Evelio Ramos Díaz:
Bishop Evelio Ramos Díaz (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Cristobal de la Habana

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015