Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justin Mulenga

Deceased

Bishop of Mpika, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Feb 1955Born
18 Jul 199338.3Ordained PriestPriest of Kasama, Zambia
23 Dec 201560.8AppointedBishop of Mpika, Zambia
12 Mar 201661.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mpika, Zambia
20 Mar 202065.0DiedBishop of Mpika, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Justin Mulenga
Bishop Justin Mulenga (born , died ) Bishop of Mpika

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRosa Mission
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, St. Joseph, Cathedral, Mpika, Diocese of Mpika
Death PlaceUniversity Teaching, Hospital, Lusaka, Archdiocese of Lusaka

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2015
  • ob: CB, 30 Dec 2015
  • c2+: CB, 12 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Number 18,856
  • d: CB, 20 Mar 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast