Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mansa

Dioecesis Mansaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Patrick Chilekwa Chisanga, O.F.M. Conv., Bishop
  • Andrew Aaron Chisha, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 22 November 1967
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Kasama
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zambia
  • Square Kilometers: 44,000 (16,995 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 710036, Mansa, Zambia
  • Telephone: (02)82.13.73
  • Fax: 82.13.80

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Rosebery
10 July 1952ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Bangueolo Prefecture Apostolic of Fort Rosebery (erected)
Diocese of Fort Rosebery
3 January 1961ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Fort Rosebery Diocese of Fort Rosebery
Diocese of Mansa
22 November 1967Name ChangedDiocese of Fort Rosebery Diocese of Mansa

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Mansa
1970111,127442,71025.1%847552,0205837ap1971
1980146,000514,00028.4%536413,560464112ap1981
1990180,730513,60035.2%1925444,107314513ap1991
1999327,587700,50046.8%2815437,618188316ap2000
2000463,047918,00050.4%29164510,289197316ap2001
2001388,3961,000,00038.8%3015458,631166816ap2002
2002388,3961,000,00038.8%3813517,615158016ap2003
2003403,511988,24940.8%3915547,472177716ap2004
2004474,252927,19751.1%3515509,485207516ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 6 Nov 2014