Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Lusaka

Archidioecesis Lusakensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Telesphore George Mpundu, Archbishop
  • Emmanuel Milingo, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 25 April 1959
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Zambia
  • Square Kilometers: 92,240 (35,627 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 32754, 41 Wamulwa Rd., 10101 Lusaka, Zambia
  • Telephone: (01)239.257
  • Fax: 290.631

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Broken Hill
14 July 1927ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Zambese Prefecture Apostolic of Broken Hill (erected)
25 May 1936Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Broken Hill Prefecture Apostolic of Victoria Falls (erected)
8 January 1938Territory LostPrefecture Apostolic of Broken Hill Prefecture Apostolic of Ndola (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Lusaka
13 June 1946Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Broken Hill Prefecture Apostolic of Lusaka
Vicariate Apostolic of Lusaka
14 July 1950ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lusaka Vicariate Apostolic of Lusaka
Archdiocese of Lusaka
25 April 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Lusaka Archdiocese of Lusaka (erected)
10 March 1962Territory LostArchdiocese of Lusaka Diocese of Monze (erected)
29 October 2011Territory LostArchdiocese of Lusaka
Diocese of Mpika
Diocese of Kabwe (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Lusaka
195027,500450,0006.1%128299484053ap1951
Archdiocese of Lusaka
197098,060572,92417.1%1257691,4217913422ap1971
1978218,8001,600,00013.7%1659752,9179718639ap1981
1990335,0002,157,00015.5%2968973,453110522748ap1991
1999632,0002,889,50021.9%28991274,97620157766ap2000
2000635,6002,894,80422.0%291051344,743120959068ap2001
2001709,1563,084,28423.0%371141514,696122365568ap2002
2002723,3333,112,04223.2%561251813,996127066555ap2003
2003729,8963,225,09822.6%751332083,509122366969ap2004
2004736,1943,257,34422.6%481361844,00123567570ap2005
2011550,2962,294,27624.0%611301912,8818040960bul:29oct2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 6 May 2014