Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ignatius Chama

Archbishop of Kasama

Apostolic Administrator of Mpika


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Aug 1957 BornMutomo-Kawambwa
12 Aug 198427.0Ordained PriestPriest of Mansa, Zambia
17 Jul 200850.9AppointedBishop of Mpika, Zambia
28 Sep 200851.1Ordained BishopBishop of Mpika, Zambia
12 Jan 201254.4AppointedArchbishop of Kasama, Zambia
12 Jan 201254.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Mpika, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Chama:
Archbishop Ignatius Chama (born ) Archbishop of Kasama

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Kasama.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Number 15,973
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Jan 2012
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 6 Feb 2014