Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Moraza Ruiz de Azúa, O.A.R.

Prelate Emeritus of Lábrea, Amazonas


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1945 BornAraya, Spain
6 Jul 196924.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
12 Jan 199448.7AppointedPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
19 Mar 199448.9Ordained BishopPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
13 Apr 201671.0ResignedPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jesús Moraza Ruiz de Azúa
Bishop Jesús Moraza Ruiz de Azúa O.A.R. (born ) Prelate Emeritus of Lábrea

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Lábrea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 138, Number 12,303
  • c1: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 21 May 2016