Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús María Cizaurre Berdonces, O.A.R.

Bishop of Bragança do Pará


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1952 BornValtierra-Navarra, Spain
10 Sep 197220.6Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
26 Jun 197624.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
23 Feb 200048.1AppointedPrelate of Cametá, Para, Brazil
7 May 200048.3Ordained BishopPrelate of Cametá, Para, Brazil
6 Feb 201361.0AppointedBishop of Cametá, Para, Brazil
17 Aug 201664.6AppointedBishop of Bragança do Pará, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jesús María Cizaurre Berdonces
Bishop Jesús María Cizaurre Berdonces O.A.R. (born ) Bishop of Bragança do Pará

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bragança do Pará.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 159, Number 13,759
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Aug 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Aug 2016