Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Sánchez Sebastián, O.A.R.

Prelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1957 Born
22 Aug 197619.0ProfessedMember of Order of Augustinian Recollects
1979²21.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Augustinian Recollects
26 Jul 198023.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Augustinian Recollects
13 Apr 201658.7AppointedPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil
5 Jun 201658.8Ordained BishopPrelate of Lábrea, Amazonas, Brazil

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Sánchez Sebastián
Bishop Santiago Sánchez Sebastián O.A.R. (born ) Prelate of Lábrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortes, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Territorial Prelature of Lábrea.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 13 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Apr 2016
  • c3+: CB, 21 May 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,933

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast