Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Manogue

Deceased

Bishop of Sacramento, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1831Born
21 Dec 186130.7Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jul 188049.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Grass Valley, California, USA
27 Jul 188049.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Ceramus
16 Jan 188149.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ceramus
29 Feb 188452.9SucceededBishop of Grass Valley, California, USA
28 May 188655.2AppointedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA
27 Feb 189563.9DiedBishop of Sacramento, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Manogue
Bishop Patrick Manogue (born , died ) Bishop of Sacramento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDesart, Diocese of Ossory, Ireland
Ordained BishopSte. Marie, Cathedral, San Francisco, Archdiocese of San Francisco, California

  • a priest for 33.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 196, and Page 490
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 581
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast