Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop David John James Monroe

Bishop Emeritus of Kamloops, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1941 BornVancouver
20 May 196726.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
5 Jan 200260.7AppointedBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
12 Mar 200260.9Ordained BishopBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
18 Mar 200260.9InstalledBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
1 Jun 201675.1RetiredBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for David John James Monroe
Bishop David John James Monroe (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kamloops

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kamloops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,146
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 1 Oct 2016