Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Phuong Nguyen

Bishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1957 Born
30 May 199235.1Ordained PriestPriest of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
1 Jun 201659.1AppointedBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada
25 Aug 201659.4Ordained BishopBishop of Kamloops, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Joseph Phuong Nguyen
Bishop Joseph Phuong Nguyen (born ) Bishop of Kamloops

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHa Lan, Viet Nam
Ordained BishopSandman Centre, Kamloops, Diocese of Kamloops, British Columbia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kamloops.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2016
  • mn/c1: CB, 1 Jun 2016
  • ob: CB, 3 Jun 2016
  • c2+: CB, 15 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,084

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast