Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Richard Joseph Gagnon

Archbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1948 BornLethbridge
24 Jun 198335.0Ordained PriestPriest of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
14 May 200455.9AppointedBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
20 Jul 200456.1Ordained BishopBishop of Victoria, British Columbia, Canada
28 Oct 201365.4AppointedArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada
3 Jan 201465.5InstalledArchbishop of Winnipeg, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Richard Joseph Gagnon:
Archbishop Richard Joseph Gagnon (born ) Archbishop of Winnipeg

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Winnipeg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,657
  • ab: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2013
  • i: CB, 24 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 24 Dec 2013