Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laureano Vérez de Acevedo, S.J. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of Nyssa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1844BornRibadeo, Spain
21 Sep 187127.2Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
22 Aug 190864.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
16 Oct 190864.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
31 Jan 192075.6DiedTitular Bishop of Nyssa

MicroData Summary for Laureano Vérez de Acevedo:
Bishop Laureano Vérez de Acevedo S.J. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of Nyssa

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013