Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Francis Eich, O.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Great Namaqualand

Titular Bishop of Cynopolis in Aegypto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1888BornEnsheim, Germany
16 May 191426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of St. Francis de Sales
28 Apr 194254.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Great Namaqualand, Namibia
28 Apr 194254.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cynopolis in Aegypto
29 Jun 194254.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cynopolis in Aegypto
10 Nov 194254.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Great Namaqualand, Namibia
4 Feb 194758.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Great Namaqualand, Namibia

MicroData Summary for John Francis Eich:
Bishop John Francis Eich O.S.F.S. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Great Namaqualand

  • a priest for 32.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • c2+: CB
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 28
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013