Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Thomas B. Russell

Deceased

Bishop of Charleston, South Carolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1863BornBaltimore
21 Jun 188925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
7 Dec 191653.1AppointedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
15 Mar 191753.4Ordained BishopBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA
18 Mar 192763.4DiedBishop of Charleston, South Carolina, USA

MicroData Summary for William Thomas B. Russell:
Bishop William Thomas B. Russell (born , died ) Bishop of Charleston

  • a priest for 37.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013