Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús Moliné Labarte

Bishop Emeritus of Chiclayo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1939 BornPuebla de Alfindén, Spain
28 Mar 196526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Piura, Peru
8 Feb 199758.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Chiclayo, Peru
19 Mar 199758.1Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Chiclayo, Peru
4 May 199859.3SucceededBishop of Chiclayo, Peru
3 Nov 201475.8RetiredBishop of Chiclayo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Jesús Moliné Labarte:
Bishop Jesús Moliné Labarte (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Chiclayo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chiclayo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 12,989
  • r: Bollettino, 3 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 26 Nov 2014