Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio María de Orbegozo y Goicoechea

Deceased

Bishop of Chiclayo, Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1922Born
1 Jun 195129.1Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
12 Apr 195735.0AppointedPrelate of Yauyos, Peru
29 Oct 196341.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Ariassus
25 Jan 196441.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ariassus
26 Apr 196846.0AppointedBishop of Chiclayo, Peru
4 May 199876.1DiedBishop of Chiclayo, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ignacio María de Orbegozo y Goicoechea
Bishop Ignacio María de Orbegozo y Goicoechea (born , died ) Bishop of Chiclayo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilboa, Spain

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast