Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Ignatius Chabrat, P.S.S. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bardstown, Kentucky

Titular Bishop of Bolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1787BornVigean, France
21 Dec 181124.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
21 Mar 183446.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
21 Mar 183446.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Bolina
20 Jul 183446.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bolina
10 Apr 184759.3ResignedCoadjutor Bishop of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA
21 Nov 186880.9DiedCoadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bardstown, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for Guy Ignatius Chabrat:
Bishop Guy Ignatius Chabrat P.S.S. (born , died ) Coadjutor Bishop Emeritus of Bardstown

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 105, and Page 114

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013