Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Mottola

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Montenegro

Titular Archbishop of Cercina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1935BornAversa
2 Apr 196025.2Ordained PriestPriest of Aversa, Italy
16 Jul 199964.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Cercina
16 Jul 199964.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iran
21 Sep 199964.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Cercina
25 Jan 200772.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Montenegro
10 Jan 201075.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Montenegro
8 Oct 201479.7DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Montenegro

MicroData Summary for Angelo Mottola:
Archbishop Angelo Mottola (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Montenegro

  • a priest for 54.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,618
  • d: CB, 8 Oct 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v2.9.9, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 9 Oct 2014