Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Pallaroni

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1885BornCastel San Giovanni
21 Dec 190722.7Ordained PriestPriest
17 Apr 193146.0AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
7 Jun 193146.2Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
17 Apr 194459.0DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Pallaroni:
Bishop Teodoro Pallaroni (born , died ) Bishop of Sarsina

  • a priest for 36.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 25

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015