Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ettore Lodi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

Titular Bishop of Messene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1859BornBudrio
Nov 1883³23.9Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 192565.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy
6 Mar 192565.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Messene
25 Mar 192565.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Messene
6 Jul 193575.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ettore Lodi:
Bishop Ettore Lodi (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Bologna

  • a priest for 51.7 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1925, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013