Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adelchi Albanesi

Deceased

Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jul 1883Born
29 Jan 190622.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Dec 193754.4AppointedBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
30 Jan 193854.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
14 Apr 194258.7AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
15 May 195672.8AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
21 Mar 197086.7DiedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Adelchi Albanesi
Archbishop Adelchi Albanesi (born , died ) Bishop of Viterbo e Tuscania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastel San Giovanni

  • a priest for 64.1 years
  • a bishop for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast