Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Boiardi

Deceased

Bishop of Apuania, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1899Born
7 Mar 192525.6Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 194546.2AppointedBishop of Apuania, Italy
27 Jan 194646.5Ordained BishopBishop of Apuania, Italy
24 Feb 197070.6DiedBishop of Apuania, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Boiardi
Bishop Carlo Boiardi (born , died ) Bishop of Apuania

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRocchetta di Lugugnano

  • a priest for 44.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast