Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaetano Malchiodi

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loreto

Titular Archbishop of Amasea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1878BornPiacenza, Italy
22 Jul 190022.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jan 193557.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Loreto, Italy
25 Jan 193557.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Cana
10 Feb 193557.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cana
26 Jan 196082.0RetiredVicar Apostolic of Loreto, Italy
26 Jan 196082.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
22 Jan 196587.0DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loreto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Malchiodi:
Archbishop Gaetano Malchiodi (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Loreto

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015