Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Longinotti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of San Severino (-Treia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1886BornSanta Maria del Taro
6 Aug 191124.7Ordained PriestPriest
22 Oct 193447.9AppointedBishop of San Severino (-Treia), Italy
30 Nov 193448.0Ordained BishopBishop of San Severino (-Treia), Italy
5 Oct 196679.8RetiredBishop of San Severino (-Treia), Italy
5 Oct 196679.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
6 Jan 197689.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Thubursicum
9 Nov 197790.9DiedBishop Emeritus of San Severino (-Treia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Longinotti:
Bishop Ferdinando Longinotti (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of San Severino (-Treia)

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013