Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Pedro Misiara

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Dec 1917Born
24 Apr 194325.3Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 197658.9AppointedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Dec 197659.0Ordained BishopBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 May 199577.4ResignedBishop of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 May 200486.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Bragança Paulista, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Pedro Misiara
Bishop Antônio Pedro Misiara (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bragança Paulista

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTietê

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast