Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Orozco Lomelín

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

Titular Bishop of Vita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1917BornLagos de Moreno
27 Oct 194023.3Ordained PriestPriest
19 Mar 195234.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District
19 Mar 195234.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vita
20 Jun 195235.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vita
17 Oct 199073.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of México, Federal District

MicroData Summary for Francisco Orozco Lomelín:
Bishop Francisco Orozco Lomelín (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of México

  • a priest for 50.0 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1952, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013