Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José de Jesús Angulo del Valle y Navarro

Deceased

Bishop of Tabasco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1888BornHacenda del Valle
19 Nov 191628.4Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 194556.9AppointedBishop of Tabasco, México
29 Jun 194557.0Ordained BishopBishop of Tabasco, México
19 Sep 196678.2DiedBishop of Tabasco, México

MicroData Summary for José de Jesús Angulo del Valle y Navarro:
Bishop José de Jesús Angulo del Valle y Navarro (born , died ) Bishop of Tabasco

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1967, Page 1,384
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 33
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,041

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013