Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Eduardo Bösl, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez

Titular Bishop of Thibuzabetum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1925BornHirschau, Germany
8 Jul 195126.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
18 Dec 197247.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez, Bolivia
18 Dec 197247.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thibuzabetum
1 Apr 197348.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thibuzabetum
13 Oct 200075.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Antonio Eduardo Bösl:
Bishop Antonio Eduardo Bösl O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Ñuflo de Chávez

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 122
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013