Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eugene Augustine Garvey

Deceased

Bishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Oct 1845Born
22 Sep 186923.9Ordained PriestPriest of Scranton, Pennsylvania, USA
31 May 190155.6AppointedBishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA
8 Sep 190155.9Ordained BishopBishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA
22 Oct 192075.0DiedBishop of Altoona, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Eugene Augustine Garvey
(WikiData: Q5407005)
Bishop Eugene Augustine Garvey (born , died ) Bishop of Altoona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarbondale, PA, Diocese of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania
Ordained PriestScranton, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania
Ordained BishopSaint Peter, Cathedral, Scranton, Diocese of Scranton, Pennsylvania
Death PlaceAltoona, Diocese of Altoona, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 51.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 91
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1901, Number 48
  • c1: CB, 11 May 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024