Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Joseph O’Reilly

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA

Titular Bishop of Lebedus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1850Born
24 Jun 187727.1Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 190050.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA
3 Jul 190050.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Lebedus
21 Sep 190050.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lebedus
16 Dec 192373.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Peoria, Illinois, USA

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph O’Reilly
Bishop Peter Joseph O’Reilly (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Peoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoynalty, Ireland

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 336

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast