Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Aversa

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio to Bavaria

Titular Archbishop of Sardes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1862Born
1885¹22.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 1906³44.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Cuba
25 May 1906³44.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to Puerto Rico
1 Aug 190644.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sardes
8 Sep 190644.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Sardes
21 Oct 190947.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Venezuela
27 Feb 191149.0AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Brazil
4 Dec 191654.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria
12 Apr 191755.2DiedApostolic Nuncio to Bavaria

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Aversa (VIAF: 47938163)
Archbishop Giuseppe Aversa (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio of Bavaria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
Death PlaceMonaco

  • a priest for 32.2 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 55
  • nunc: Le Nunziature Apostoliche (Marchi), Page 59, and Page 80, and Page 262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 12 Mar 2018