Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Frausto Pallares

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of León, Guanajuato, México

Titular Bishop of Vagrauta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jul 1941 Born
21 Jun 196826.9Ordained PriestPriest of León, Guanajuato, México
10 Dec 200564.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of León, Guanajuato, México
10 Dec 200564.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagrauta
24 Feb 200664.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagrauta
28 Oct 201675.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of León, Guanajuato, México

MicroData Summary for Juan Frausto Pallares
Bishop Juan Frausto Pallares (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTomelópez

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of León.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Dec 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,069
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast