Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Armindo Lopes Coelho

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Porto, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1931Born
1 Aug 195423.4Ordained PriestPriest of Porto, Portugal
16 Nov 197847.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Porto, Portugal
16 Nov 197847.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Elvas
25 Mar 197948.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elvas
15 Oct 198251.6AppointedBishop of Viana do Castelo, Portugal
13 Jun 199766.3AppointedBishop of Porto, Portugal
22 Feb 200776.0RetiredBishop of Porto, Portugal
29 Sep 201079.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Porto, Portugal

MicroData Summary for Armindo Lopes Coelho
Bishop Armindo Lopes Coelho (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Porto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRegilde

  • a priest for 56.1 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Feb 2007
  • d: Vatican Information Service
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 30 Oct 2018

Quantcast