Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ji-Paraná

Dioecesis Giparanensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Bruno Pedron, S.D.B., Bishop
  • Antônio Possamai, S.D.B., Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 19 February 1983
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Porto Velho
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Rondonia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 100,000 (38,625 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte 1
  • Mailing Address: Rua Marechal Rondon 400, 78961-390 Ji-Parana, RO, Brazil
  • Telephone: (069)3416-4203
  • Fax: 3416-4202

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Vila Rondônia
3 January 1978ErectedTerritorial Prelature of Guajará-Mirim
Territorial Prelature of Porto Velho
Territorial Prelature of Vila Rondônia (erected)
Diocese of Ji-Paraná
19 February 1983ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Vila Rondônia Diocese of Ji-Paraná
23 December 1997Territory LostArchdiocese of Diamantina
Diocese of Ji-Paraná
Diocese of Juína (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of Vila Rondônia
1980231,000352,00065.6%131317,769162130ap1981
Diocese of Ji-Paraná
1990400,000500,00080.0%736439,302446920ap1991
1999486,500695,43570.0%7273414,308142820ap2000
2000457,500750,00061.0%1545607,625577020ap2001
2001426,000700,00060.9%1532479,063378219ap2002
2002500,000700,00071.4%1635519,803397119ap2003
2003500,000700,00071.4%16294511,111347419ap2004
2004480,000709,93867.6%21274810,000316319ap2005
2006409,000733,00055.8%2425498,346366719ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 3 Dec 2011