Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Agostino Gaetano Cardinal Riboldi

Deceased

Archbishop of Ravenna, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1839Born
11 Aug 186122.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Mar 187738.0AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
22 Apr 187738.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
15 Apr 190162.1AppointedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy
15 Apr 190162.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Apr 190162.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
25 Apr 190263.1DiedArchbishop of Ravenna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Agostino Gaetano Riboldi (VIAF: 89353361)
Agostino Gaetano Cardinal Riboldi (born , died ) Archbishop of Ravenna

EventPlace
Birth PlacePaderno Dugnano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopCathedral, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia
Death PlaceRavenna, Archdiocese of Ravenna
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Pavia, Diocese of Pavia

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 25.0 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,543
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 439, and Page 477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Apr 1901
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 May 2017