Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hubert Michael Newell

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cheyenne, Wyoming


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Feb 1904BornDenver, CO
15 Jun 193026.3Ordained PriestPriest of Denver, Colorado, USA
2 Aug 194743.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
2 Aug 194743.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Zapara
24 Sep 194743.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Zapara
8 Nov 195147.7SucceededBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
3 Jan 197873.9ResignedBishop of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA
8 Sep 198783.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Cheyenne, Wyoming, USA

MicroData Summary for Hubert Michael Newell:
Bishop Hubert Michael Newell (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cheyenne

  • a priest for 57.2 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1947, Number 98

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013