Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ilario Antoniazzi

Archbishop of Tunis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1948 BornRai (San Polo di Piave), Italy
24 Jun 197224.2Ordained PriestPriest of Jerusalem {Gerusalemme}, Palestine
21 Feb 201364.8AppointedArchbishop of Tunis, Tunisia
16 Mar 201364.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Tunis, Tunisia
7 Apr 201365.0InstalledArchbishop of Tunis, Tunisia

MicroData Summary for Ilario Antoniazzi:
Archbishop Ilario Antoniazzi (born ) Archbishop of Tunis

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tunis.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Feb 2013
  • c1/ob/i: CB, 21 Feb 2013
  • c2+: CB, 18 Mar 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 213, Number 17,665

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013