Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude Jean Narcisse Rault, M. Afr.

Bishop Emeritus of Laghouat, Algeria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1940 Born
18 Jun 196625.5ProfessedMember of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
29 Jun 196827.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
26 Oct 200463.9AppointedBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
16 Dec 200464.0Ordained BishopBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
19 Dec 200464.0InstalledBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
16 Mar 201776.3RetiredBishop of Laghouat, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Claude Jean Narcisse Rault (VIAF: 17385122)
Bishop Claude Jean Narcisse Rault M. Afr. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Laghouat

EventPlace
Birth PlacePoilly, France

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Laghouat.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,728
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Mar 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Mar 2017