Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Pierre Mabile

Deceased

Bishop of Versailles, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1800Born
19 Dec 182929.2Ordained PriestPriest
9 Jul 185150.8SelectedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
5 Sep 185150.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
11 Nov 185151.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Claude, France
23 Jan 185857.3SelectedBishop of Versailles, France
15 Mar 185857.4ConfirmedBishop of Versailles, France
21 May 185857.6InstalledBishop of Versailles, France
8 May 187776.6DiedBishop of Versailles, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Pierre Mabile (VIAF: 103649649)
Bishop Jean-Pierre Mabile (born , died ) Bishop of Versailles

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRurey
Ordained BishopMontauban, Diocese of Montauban

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 208, and Page 587
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 22 Jan 2017