Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Launcelot John Goody

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Perth


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1908BornLondon, Great Britain
20 Dec 193022.5Ordained PriestPriest of Perth, Australia
2 Aug 195143.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Perth, Australia
2 Aug 195143.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Abydus
1 Nov 195143.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abydus
12 Nov 195446.4AppointedBishop of Bunbury, Australia
18 Oct 196860.4AppointedArchbishop of Perth, Australia
26 Oct 198375.4RetiredArchbishop of Perth, Australia
13 May 199283.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Perth, Australia

MicroData Summary for Launcelot John Goody:
Archbishop Launcelot John Goody (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Perth

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for 40.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013